DE HB439 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill authorizes the Thoroughbred Racing Commission to be a member of the new Interstate Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards Compact. Under the Bill the Thoroughbred Racing Commission would become a member of an interstate Compact with other party states for the establishment of uniform standards for drug testing of horses participating in horse racing. The Harness Racing Commission will not be a member of the Compact. The purpose of the Compact is to establish uniform requirements among the party states for the drug testing of horses participating in horse racing. The Compact Committee would be comprised of one representative from each party state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Horse Racing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-28 Rules Suspended in Senate
2018-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-26 Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate
2018-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2018-06-05 Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback