DE HB437 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows the background plates (animal welfare, farmland preservation, Marine Education Research and Rehabilitation Institute, Delaware Equine Council, and Keep Delaware Beautiful) issued by DMV to be displayed on trailers up to 26,000 pounds gross vehicle weight rating (GVWR). It also increases the size of trucks that can display the plates from ¾ ton (10,000 pounds GVWR) to 26,000 pounds GVWR.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Registration Of Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-07-01 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |