DE HB437 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill allows the background plates (animal welfare, farmland preservation, Marine Education Research and Rehabilitation Institute, Delaware Equine Council, and Keep Delaware Beautiful) issued by DMV to be displayed on trailers up to 26,000 pounds gross vehicle weight rating (GVWR). It also increases the size of trucks that can display the plates from ¾ ton (10,000 pounds GVWR) to 26,000 pounds GVWR.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Registration Of Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28 Signed by Governor
2018-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-07-01 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2018-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2018-06-05 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback