DE HB433 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies what constitutes a sawmill in the State of Delaware and adds definitions related to agriculture and silviculture. This Act recognizes forest products as unadulterated materials and makes clear their importance to support a thriving industry that maintains sustainable and healthy forests. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Silviculture.
Sponsors
Rep. William Carson [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Sherry Dorsey Walker [D] | Sen. David Lawson [R] |
Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] | Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-16 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |