DE HB432 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The Division of Small Business, Development and Tourism was created by 81 Del. Laws ch. 49 and placed in the Department of State. This enactment transferred certain responsibilities for economic development, formerly in the Delaware Department of Economic Development, to this Division.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Delaware Code Relating To Administrative Matters Involving The Transfer Of State Economic Development Functions To The Department Of State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10 Signed by Governor
2018-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-28 Rules Suspended in Senate
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-26 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2018-06-26 Amendment HA 1 to HB 432 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 11 On Its Merits
2018-06-05 Amendment HA 1 to HB 432 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-30 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback