DE HB432 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The Division of Small Business, Development and Tourism was created by 81 Del. Laws ch. 49 and placed in the Department of State. This enactment transferred certain responsibilities for economic development, formerly in the Delaware Department of Economic Development, to this Division.
Title
An Act To Amend The Delaware Code Relating To Administrative Matters Involving The Transfer Of State Economic Development Functions To The Department Of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-28 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-26 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2018-06-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 432 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 432 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |