DE HB432 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends the Charter of the Town of Elsmere. Section 1 removes a cap on the amount of indebtedness the Town may incur to meet “current expenses.” Section 2 places a cap on the power to borrow money for municipal repair and improvements at $20 million rather than the previous cap of 4 % of aggregate assessed real property value, and removes other language regarding the form and substance of revenue bonds. Section 3 eliminates the requirement for a referendum for raising money, and the requirements of two-thirds affirmative vote for a bond issue. It also removes the requirement that bonds be sold to the highest bidder after publication. Section 3 continues to set out the procedure for notifying the public of the Town’s intent to borrow.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Elsmere.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 8 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2016-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |