DE HB431 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires long-term care facilities to offer the influenza vaccine to all employees with direct contact with patients. It also requires the facility to keep a record of a signed statement from each employee that the vaccine has been offered.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Long-term Care Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 431 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 431 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 12 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-07 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |