DE HB430 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill authorizes the Department of Agriculture to utilize any laboratory designated by the Department of Agriculture rather than only the State Chemist to analyze samples of foods, dairy and other feeds and insecticides, and to cooperate with the United States Department of Agriculture and other federal agencies in the enforcement of the laws related to foods, dairy and other feeds, and insecticides.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-28 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-26 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |