DE HB430 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill authorizes the Department of Agriculture to utilize any laboratory designated by the Department of Agriculture rather than only the State Chemist to analyze samples of foods, dairy and other feeds and insecticides, and to cooperate with the United States Department of Agriculture and other federal agencies in the enforcement of the laws related to foods, dairy and other feeds, and insecticides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13 Signed by Governor
2018-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-28 Rules Suspended in Senate
2018-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-26 Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate
2018-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2018-05-30 Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback