DE HB425 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
House Bill 245, enacted into law on February 1, 2010, changed the number of registered voters required for a political party to be listed on the general election ballot from 5/100 of 1 percent of the total number of voters registered in Delaware to 10/100 of 1 percent. To ensure fairness to all political parties, as House Bill 245 was enacted during the year of a general election, this bill returns the previous requirement of 5/100 of 1 percent of the total number of registered voters for a political party to be listed on the general election ballot. The requirement of 5/100 of 1 percent of registered voters will remain in effect until after the general election at which time it will return to 10/100 of 1 percent of the total number of registered voters.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-10 | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-10 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-27 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |