DE HB422 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act dissolves the Delaware Interagency Council on Homelessness (DICH). The DICH has been an important venue for significant progress in addressing homelessness in Delaware. However, changes to the primary source of federal assistance for resources for homelessness required the establishment of a Continuum of Care. The similar goals, tasks, and membership of the Continuum of Care have made the DICH obsolete and duplicative of these efforts.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Interagency Council On Homelessness.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-19 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |