DE HB422 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act dissolves the Delaware Interagency Council on Homelessness (DICH). The DICH has been an important venue for significant progress in addressing homelessness in Delaware. However, changes to the primary source of federal assistance for resources for homelessness required the establishment of a Continuum of Care. The similar goals, tasks, and membership of the Continuum of Care have made the DICH obsolete and duplicative of these efforts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Interagency Council On Homelessness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-23 Signed by Governor
2018-06-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-19 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2018-06-19 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits
2018-05-30 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback