DE HB421 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This bill modifies the existing laws regarding tree replacement for DelDOT projects. It permits the planting of trees within a DNREC-approved and maintained conservation easement area within the same or an adjacent watershed, if the normal mitigation measures cannot be implemented with existing construction project limits. The bill also gives DelDOT the opportunity to prepare and approve the landscape plan required under this subchapter, which would be performed by DelDOT’s Roadside Environmental Group. It would also remove the addition of a turn lane as a qualifying tree-planting requirement under the subchapter’s definition of a “construction project.”
Title
An Act Amending Title 17 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Reforestation Activities Of The Department Of Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-23 | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-17 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-17 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-17 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (TRANSPORTATION/LAND USE AND INFRASTRUCTURE) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-27 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |