DE HB420 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The states pre-application process for land use process, known as PLUS, was created 20 years ago and has served to increase coordination among state and local agencies. In doing so, it has fulfilled its intent of providing predictability and consistency for the development community, especially in the area of major projects. Given that success, this bill assists in expediting the process for economic development projects in the State of Delaware with some exemptions from the PLUS process. A project located in Investment Level 1 or 2 under the Strategies for State Policies and Spending that is consistent with local zoning and any local comprehensive plan that will create full-time jobs is exempt from the pre-application process unless required by the local government or requested by the applicant.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Land Use Planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-19 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2022-05-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2022-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 4 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |