DE HB419 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judicial & Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Unmanned aircraft systems are capable of introducing contraband into detention facilities without undergoing correctional officer inspections. This bill seeks to prohibit the use of unmanned aircraft systems (drones) to introduce contraband into detention facilities. This bill makes it a class F felony to deliver or attempt to deliver contraband by use of a drone.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unmanned Aircraft Systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-26 Amendment HA 1 to HB 419 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-26 Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to HB 419 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-05-30 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback