DE HB419 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judicial & Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judicial & Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Unmanned aircraft systems are capable of introducing contraband into detention facilities without undergoing correctional officer inspections. This bill seeks to prohibit the use of unmanned aircraft systems (drones) to introduce contraband into detention facilities. This bill makes it a class F felony to deliver or attempt to deliver contraband by use of a drone.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unmanned Aircraft Systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 419 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 419 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House |