DE HB418 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 provides that unpaid taxes shall become first liens against property of the owner for a period of ten (10) years from the date of the assessment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Seaford.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-14 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-06-14 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-14 Amendment HA 1 to HB 418 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-13 Amendment HA 1 to HB 418 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-30 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback