DE HB410 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act is the second leg of a constitutional amendment that would alter the continuity of government provisions of the Delaware Constitution to enable the effective continuance of government following a variety of emergency situations. The first leg of this amendment, House Bill No. 380 of the 148th General Assembly, passed both Houses with the two-thirds vote required by, and was publicized in accordance with, the Delaware Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concurring In Proposed Amendments To The Delaware Constitution Relating To Continuity Of Governmental Operations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2018-06-12 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-05-08 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback