DE HB41 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
As the State mental health delivery system evolves from a primarily institutional to a community-based model, it is important to define minimum patient rights in community facilities. This Act establishes a community mental health treatment act with rights paralleling those of patients in the substance abuse treatment system compiled in Chapter 22 of Title 16 of the Delaware Code.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Creating A Community Mental Health Treatment Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Booth [R] | Rep. Richard Cathcart [R] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. James Johnson [D] |
Rep. Nick Manolakos [R] | Rep. Hazel Plant [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-17 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-15 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-15 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-02 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-27 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |