DE HB408 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on October 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on October 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act would add designation that the holder is a veteran to the Delaware Driver License or Identification Card upon request. Adding designation that the holder is a veteran to a Driver License or Identification Card would eliminate the need for a veteran to carry a separate card or official discharge forms in order to prove their service.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Indicating The Holder Is A Veteran On Driver Licenses And Nondriver Identification Cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-09 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 16 Favorable | |
2022-05-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House |