DE HB407 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act provides that all current employees, prospective employees, contractors and subcontractors of the Department of Labor with access to federal tax information shall be subject to appropriate background checks to ensure that the Department of Labor complies with obligations imposed by ยง 6103(p)(4) of the Internal Revenue Code and by the Internal Revenue Service in Publication 1075.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unemployment Insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11 Signed by Governor
2018-06-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-14 Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
2018-06-14 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2018-05-03 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback