DE HB407 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill amends the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act relating to the registration of child support orders, income-withholding orders, or both, from other states. The amendments provide that such orders can be registered in Delaware by either the foreign jurisdiction or the applicable support enforcement agency in Delaware sending those orders (and other pertinent information) directly to the Family Court, either physically or by electronic transmission. This Bill also removes the requirement that two copies of such order be provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Registration Of Child Support Orders And Income-withholding Orders From Other Jurisdictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-06HouseSigned by Governor
2014-06-30SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-06-26SenateReported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2014-06-19SenateAssigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
2014-06-19HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-06-19HouseAmendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2014-06-19HouseAmendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2014-06-18HouseReported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits
2014-06-17HouseRe-Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2014-06-17HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback