DE HB405 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing that a criminal charge can dramatically alter a juvenile's future chances of employment and education, this bill seeks to prevent first-time juvenile offenders charged with certain minor misdemeanors from entering into the system by providing law enforcement with a civil citation procedure as an alternative to arrest. Section 1 of this Act codifies the Juvenile Offender Civil Citation Program administered by the Division of Youth Rehabilitative Services within the Department of Services for Children, Youth and Their Families. Section 2 of this Act mandates that the Civil Citation Coordinator and the Quality Assurance Unit of the Division of Youth and Rehabilitative Services will collect and analyze program data, and make annual recommendations to the Criminal Justice Council/Juvenile Justice Advisory Group and the General Assembly. Section 3 of this Act states that it shall expire 2 years after its enactment into law unless otherwise provided by a subsequent act of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Establishment Of A Juvenile Offender Civil Citation Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-06HouseSigned by Governor
2016-07-01SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-30SenateReported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2016-06-22SenateAssigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
2016-06-22HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-22HouseAmendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2016-06-22HouseAmendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2016-06-15HouseReported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits, 4 Unfavorable
2016-06-09HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback