DE HB405 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill aligns the licensing and certification of nurseries to the calendar year and requires nurseries to maintain a current list of suppliers and provide that list to the Department of Agriculture upon request. The bill also eliminates the brief 30-day window during which an administrative hearing must be held but retains the 30-day period for issuance of the Department’s written decision. The current 30-day time period in which a hearing must be held has been inhibiting the ability of the Department of Agriculture to negotiate resolution of violations regarding nurseries and nursery stock.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-10 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-10 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-02 | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |