DE HB401 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Currently the US FDA is reviewing a New Drug Application (NDA) of a pharmaceutical product containing cannabidiol (CBD) to treat patients with rare pediatric seizure disorders. If approved, this drug will be required to be prescribed and dispensed like other FDA approved products. However, to make sure that this product and future FDA approved marijuana containing products are available to patients as soon as possible, a change in Delaware law is required. This bill would exempt federally lawful FDA approved marijuana containing products from Schedule I of the states Controlled Substances Act until they are rescheduled under Delaware law. This would allow patient access to new therapies without an administrative delay, and allow FDA approved marijuana containing medicines to be prescribed, dispensed and regulated like other FDA approved pharmaceutical products. Illegal possession or sale of these drugs would be prosecuted as any other violation of the Controlled Substance Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Sen. Anthony Delcollo [R] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Rep. David Bentz [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Spiegelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-09 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |