DE HB401 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act generates revenues needed for statewide wildlife conservation and for public access facilities on and the management and maintenance of public wildlife areas owned or managed by the Division of Fish and Wildlife (“Division”) by increasing fees for existing hunting and trapping licenses and by establishing a conservation access pass to be purchased by non-hunters for motor vehicles accessing these public lands. A conservation access pass would not be required to access certain such public lands to include the Michael Castle Trail portion of the C&D Canal Conservation Area, designated fishing or boating access areas, educational or shooting range facilities, and lands leased from the Division. Revenues generated by this Act would be leveraged by the Division to obtain federal grant funds at a ratio of $1 of state funds to $3 of federal funds, with current state wildlife program revenues insufficient to fully leverage available federal funds. The Act establishes a private license agent service charge for the sale of conservation access passes similar to previously established service charges for the sale of hunting and trapping licenses. Additional changes clarify inconsistent and update obsolete language, primarily involving terminology used for existing fee categories. Fee increases and the conservation access pass would be effective July 1, 2017.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Mulrooney [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Ronald Gray [R] |
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |
2016-06-14 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-02 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |