DE HB400 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Laid On Table in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Laid On Table in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 of this Bill adds a provision to the Health-Care Decisions statute authorizing a medical order which is transportable, standardized, and implements a patient's end-of-life care preferences. In order to implement that statute, adjustments are made in Section 2 to the existing advance-care directive statute, and in Section 3 to the statute governing Emergency Medical Services. Section 3 also makes a technical name change within Chapter 97 that was overlooked in a 2003 change to Chapter 97 and adds reference to DMOST in Public Health’s rule writing authority.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Creation Of Medical Orders For Scope Of Treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 25 YES 14 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2014-06-11 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |