DE HB40 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill: (1) increases the number of directors on the Board and allows the Board to appoint four additional directors; (2) implements clarifying language; (3) sunsets the former Advisory Council to replace it with a subcommittee structure to allow greater participation from members of the public and to allow the Corporation to appoint and receive assistance and expertise from a greater variety of experts; and (4) allows the Board of Directors to amend the Certificate of Incorporation with approval from the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Fort Dupont Redevelopment And Preservation Corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-05-16 Amendment SA 1 to HB 40 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-03-06 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental & Natural Resources) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2019-01-22 Assigned to Environmental & Natural Resources Committee in Senate
2019-01-22 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-01-16 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2019-01-10 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback