DE HB40 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill: (i) corrects a typo in 1917 of Title 18 relating to endorsement of contract, by changing “insurer” to “purchaser” to bring this section into alignment with 1914 of the same title; and (ii) changes the word “affidavit” in 1923 of Title 18 to “written statement” so that notarized signatures are not required on the Delaware Insurance Department Surplus Lines Statement of Diligent Effort form.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Surplus Lines Coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE & TELECOMMUNICATIONS) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance & Telecommunications Committee in Senate |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |