DE HB4 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This legislation amends the Delaware Code to establish the Department of Human Resources by transferring various divisions and other organizational units from the Office of Management and Budget to the newly established Department of Human Resources. The powers and duties of the Director of the Office of Management and Budget and the Secretary of the Department of Human Resources are aligned to reflect the transfers of the divisions and other organizational units of the newly established Department of Human Resources. Various sections of the Delaware Code are amended to reflect changes in titles and nomenclature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 14, 15, 18, 19, 29 And 31 Of The Delaware Code To Provide For The Reorganization Of State Government By Creating The Department Of Human Resources; Transferring Selected Divisions And Other Organizational Units From The Office Of Management And Budget And Department Of State To The Department Of Human Resources; Amending References To Superseded Agencies Or Officers; Aligning The Duties Of The Secretary Of Human Resources, The Director Of The Office Of Management And Budget, And The Secretary Of State; And To Provide For The Reorganization Of The Office Of The Commission On Women By Creating The Office Of Womens Advancement And Advocacy Within The Department Of Human Resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-16 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-20 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2017-06-20 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 1 to HB 4 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-14 Amendment HA 1 to HB 4 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-06 Introduced in House and Assigned to House Administration Committee

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback