DE HB399 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill will create the Inspire Scholarship Program. Inspire scholarships are available to Delaware students with excellent credentials and economic need to attend Delaware State University. The intent of this program is to increase the number of students in Delaware who attend college and complete degree programs. The amounts available to these grant recipients are subject to available funds and are capped at the grant amount available to SEED grant recipients. Inspire scholarship recipients must continue to make excellent academic progress toward a degree and must complete at least ten hours of community service per semester.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-09-21 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-09-21 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2010-07-02 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 32 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 8 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Amendment HA 3 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-30 | Amendment HA 2 - Stricken | |
2010-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-29 | Amendment HA 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2010-06-02 | Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-01 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2010-06-01 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-05-13 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2010-05-12 | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 11 Favorable | |
2010-05-06 | Introduced in House and assigned to Education Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Assigned to Education Committee in House |