DE HB398 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill authorizes the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control to extend the muskrat open season pursuant to regulations. By regulation the Department will be able to consider severe winter weather conditions and the status of the muskrat population being able to sustain additional harvesting before making a decision to extend the season.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Extension Of Muskrat Season.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2010-06-30 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2010-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-08 | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-03 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-02 | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |