DE HB397 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act permits the Superior Court to consider petitions out of sequence where the Attorney General consents and the Court determines consideration to be in the interest of justice. To ensure this exceptional sequencing provision is employed judiciously, the Court will only consider the consent of the Attorney General authorized by Delaware Department of Justice leadership (Attorney General, Chief Deputy Attorney General, State Prosecutor, or Chief County Prosecutors) in response to requests of Office of Defense Services leadership (Chief Defender, Chief Deputy Defender, Chief Conflicts Counsel) where a petitioner is represented by the Office of Defense Services, and in all other circumstances in response to privately retained counsel. This special authorization ensures individual petitioners do not unwittingly forego or disrupt their single opportunity for sentence review and further ensures consistency in modifications to sequencing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Criminal Procedure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11 Signed by Governor
2018-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-28 Rules Suspended in Senate
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-21 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-06-21 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2018-05-02 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback