DE HB396 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill amends the Charter of the Town of Smyrna in the following ways:
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Smyrna
Sponsors
Rep. William Carson [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Spiegelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-05 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-05 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |