DE HB396 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The time and delay associated with the review of land use projects is often a factor in determining whether a potential employer comes to Delaware or not. This bill is designed to provide an expedited review process for projects likely to have significant economic impact. It applies to new office, manufacturing and industrial uses, and excludes new residential projects and commercial (i.e., retail) projects.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Zoning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |
2016-06-21 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-21 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-06-16 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 6 On Its Merits |
2016-06-02 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |