DE HB395 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Pursuant to longstanding United States Supreme Court precedent, it is unconstitutional to require a person to be a resident of the voting state, district, or municipality for any length of time that exceeds the time necessary to effectively register voters prior to an election. See Marston v. Lewis, 410 U.S. 679 (1973); Dunn v. Blumstein, 405 U.S. 330 (1972). In Delaware, 30 days prior to the election is the current deadline for registering to vote in statewide and national elections. 15 Del. C. 2036. This bill would prohibit any municipality from enacting or maintaining any durational residency or property ownership requirement for voting eligibility, and sets the maximum deadline for registration at 30 days prior to a municipal election. This will bring Delaware’s municipal voting laws in line with federal constitutional standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Municipal Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-10SenateSigned by Governor
2016-07-01HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-07-01SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-07-01SenateAmendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-07-01SenateAmendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
2016-06-22SenateReported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2016-06-16SenateAssigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate
2016-06-16HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-16HouseAmendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2016-06-16HouseAmendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2016-06-15HouseReported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2016-06-02HouseIntroduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback