DE HB392 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 of this Act provides that the Director of Revenue shall make tax returns available via the Internet on or before January 15 of each tax year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Related To Tax Administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
2018-05-08 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2018-05-08 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2018-05-01 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback