DE HB39 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This Act extends Family Court's jurisdiction under Chapter 50, Title 16, over a youth who has a mental condition and requires services or treatment but is not amenable to or compliant with such services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Concurrent Jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-08 Signed by Governor
2017-05-03 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-03-28 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-03-28 Amendment HA 2 to HB 39 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-03-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 39 - Stricken in House
2017-03-28 Amendment HA 2 to HB 39 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-16 Amendment HA 1 to HB 39 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-15 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2017-01-18 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback