DE HB388 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 authorizes the disinterested members of the Town Council to determine if a council member meets the qualifications to be on council.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Bowers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-08 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-05-03 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |