DE HB388 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill increases the penalties for vehicle owners who are not complying with Delaware law by not registering their vehicles after establishing residency in Delaware. The current fine of $25 provides no incentive for vehicle owners to register their vehicles in Delaware. This results in the loss of a significant amount of revenue. The exemption on trailers for vehicle owners registered under the International Registration Plan (IRP) is a result of the IRP agreement Delaware signed with all other jurisdictions. Members of the military and their families are exempted by federal law from having to register vehicles in states in which they are temporarily stationed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Registration Of Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-17 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 2 NO 4 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-17 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2010-06-16 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2010-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-08 | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 1 NO 3 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-12 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |