DE HB386 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act requires that individual, group, State employee, and public assistance insurance plans provide coverage for treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome. This Act suspends this requirement for individual and group insurance plans if, under the Affordable Care Act, the State is required to assume the cost of this coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18, Title 29, And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Coverage For Treatment Of Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated With Streptococcal Infections And Pediatric Acute Onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-14 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2018-06-14 Passed By House. Votes: 30 YES 7 NO 4 ABSENT
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2018-04-25 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback