DE HB384 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill removes an out-of-date provision in the Code that authorizes Kent County Government to employ a janitor or janitors for the care of the County Courthouse. The State purchased the Kent County Courthouse from Kent County in 2003.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Government Of Kent County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-12 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-10 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-05-10 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House |