DE HB383 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-11 - Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-11 - Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act creates a special license plate for veterans for Operation Enduring Freedom.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Registration Of Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2010-05-06 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-05 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2010-04-29 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |