DE HB382 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act has the effect of renaming the Delaware Department of Transportation Welcome Center on Interstate 95 at 530 JFK Memorial Highway, Newark, Delaware as the "Biden Welcome Center" in honor of the Biden family. This gesture is made because of the exemplary service to the State of Delaware the Bidens have provided, and because of their lifelong promotion of this State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Rename The Delaware Department Of Transportation Welcome Center On Interstate 95 Located At 530 Jfk Memorial Highway Newark, De 19702 In Honor Of The Bidens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17 Signed by Governor
2018-06-19 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-05 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2018-06-05 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2018-05-02 Tabled in Committee
2018-04-24 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback