DE HB381 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Patients struggle every day to receive necessary care, suffering symptoms longer than appropriate and encountering unnecessary stress factors as they engage in the complicated system of health insurance. One such factor is Pre-Authorization, a tool designed to save the money by making sure that care is necessary. For years patients and clinicians have been put through arduous appeals processes being told that they are necessary to keep costs down or worse, told after the fact that their care won’t be paid for even when previously told otherwise. Yet, anecdotally, appeals to these decisions are nearly always granted after hours of staff and clinician time. Reliable data is difficult, if not impossible, to come by to evaluate if programs are worth the costs of time that they shift to the patient and clinician. This legislation requires greater transparency, efficiency, and fairness in pre-authorization programs.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pre-authorization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE & TELECOMMUNICATIONS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance & Telecommunications Committee in Senate |
2016-06-14 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-14 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-06-08 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2016-05-12 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |