DE HB380 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Banking, Business & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill allows first-time home buyers to pay their portion of the realty transfer tax at the rate that was in effect prior to the increase that took effect on August 1, 2017. The credit is calculated as 0.5% of the first $400,000 in home value, with a maximum allowable credit of $2,000. This legislation is retroactive for any first-time home buyer who entered into a transaction for the transfer of real estate on or after August 1, 2017. The seller in any transaction with a first-time buyer will still pay the current tax rate. The bill also removes a provision that applied to contracts entered into prior to 1971, since such provision is no longer relevant. For ease of application, the new definition of "first-time home buyer" is cross-referenced in the already existing Code provision directing the counties to exempt such buyers from any county-imposed realty transfer tax. This reduction in the tax rate for first-time home buyers will be effective for transactions entered into on or after the effective date of this Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 9 And 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Realty Transfer Tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2018-05-08 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-05-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 380 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-05-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 380 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2018-04-17 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback