DE HB38 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill places the same requirements for the issuance of non-potable well permits within existing areas where a water utility has been granted a Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity as those that currently apply to the issuance of a potable well permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Nonutility Wells And Permits For Nonutility Wells Within Service Territory Served By A Water Utility Under A Certificate Of Public Convenience And Necessity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-21 Amendment SA 1 to HB 38 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-12 Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
2017-05-11 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-11 Amendment HA 1 to HB 38 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-10 Amendment HA 1 to HB 38 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-01-18 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-01-17 Introduced in House and Assigned to House Administration Committee

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback