DE HB378 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Amendment HA 2 to HB 378 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill is intended to protect the privacy of law enforcement officers and their immediate family members by specifically exempting their personal identifying information from FOIA. The disclosure of private information of law enforcement and their immediate family members unnecessarily endangers such individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Personal Identifying Information.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10 Amendment HA 2 to HB 378 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-04-26 Amendment HA 1 to HB 378 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-04-19 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback