DE HB378 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Amendment HA 2 to HB 378 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Amendment HA 2 to HB 378 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is intended to protect the privacy of law enforcement officers and their immediate family members by specifically exempting their personal identifying information from FOIA. The disclosure of private information of law enforcement and their immediate family members unnecessarily endangers such individuals.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Personal Identifying Information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 378 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 378 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-04-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |